Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph O. Egerega

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bomadi

Titular Bishop of Tanudaia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1940BornEboh Orogun
21 Dec 196929.7Ordained PriestPriest of Warri, Nigeria
3 Mar 199756.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bomadi, Nigeria
3 Mar 199756.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
14 May 199757.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
4 Apr 200969.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bomadi, Nigeria
3 Feb 201372.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bomadi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Joseph O. Egerega:
Bishop Joseph O. Egerega (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bomadi

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,999
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 4 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015