Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude Duret, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

Titular Bishop of Antigonea

Priest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1824Born
28 Jun 185025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
185631.0AppointedPrefect of Sénégal
22 Aug 187348.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
26 Aug 187348.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
29 Sep 187348.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antigonea
29 Dec 187551.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Duret
Bishop Jean-Claude Duret C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMenthonnex-en-Bornes, France
Ordained BishopSt. Sulpice, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017