Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Di Salvo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicosia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Cissita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1922Born
29 Jun 194522.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 196846.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rossano, Italy
31 Oct 196846.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres in Numidia
21 Dec 196846.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres in Numidia
15 Dec 196947.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
197148.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
20 Dec 197654.1AppointedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
9 Apr 198461.4ResignedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
9 Apr 198461.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissita
5 Dec 200583.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicosia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Di Salvo
Bishop Salvatore Di Salvo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicosia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFleri Etneo

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018