Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos María Collazzi Irazábal, S.D.B.

Bishop of Mercedes, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1947 Born
4 Oct 198033.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Feb 199547.4AppointedBishop of Mercedes, Uruguay
26 Mar 199547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mercedes, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Carlos María Collazzi Irazábal
Bishop Carlos María Collazzi Irazábal S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Mercedes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mercedes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,540

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018