Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián Chico Martínez

Auxiliary Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

Titular Bishop of Valliposita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1968 Born
7 Jul 200133.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cartagena (en España)
20 Feb 201950.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cartagena (en España)
20 Feb 201950.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Valliposita
11 May 201950.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Valliposita

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Chico Martínez
Bishop Sebastián Chico Martínez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCehegín, Diocese of Cartagena (en España)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Murcia, Diocese of Cartagena (en España)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cartagena (en España).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2019
  • c1/ob: CB, 20 Feb 2019
  • c2: CB, 8 May 2019
  • c34: CB, 9 May 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast