Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Koorilos Chakkalapadickal

Archbishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1958 BornKaddapra Mannar
30 Dec 198527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
9 May 199738.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
9 May 199738.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
17 Jul 199738.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
15 Jan 200344.2AppointedBishop of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankarese), India
26 Mar 200748.4AppointedArchbishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
2 May 200748.5InstalledArchbishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Koorilos Chakkalapadickal:
Archbishop Thomas Koorilos Chakkalapadickal (born ) Archbishop of Tiruvalla

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,032
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013