Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Antonios Valiyavilayil, O.I.C.

Apostolic Exarch of Saint Ephrem of Khadki (Syro-Malankara)

Titular Bishop of Igilgili


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1955 BornAdoor
9 Dec 198025.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Imitation of Christ
27 Dec 198025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Imitation of Christ
25 Jan 201054.1AppointedCurial Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jan 201054.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Igilgili
13 Mar 201054.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Igilgili
26 Mar 201559.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Saint Ephrem of Khadki (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Antonios Valiyavilayil:
Bishop Thomas Antonios Valiyavilayil O.I.C. (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Saint Ephrem of Khadki

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Saint Ephrem of Khadki (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,584
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015