Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cyril Baselios Malancharuvil, O.I.C. †

Deceased

Major Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1935Born
4 Oct 196025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Imitation of Christ
28 Oct 197843.1AppointedBishop of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankara), India
28 Dec 197843.3Ordained BishopBishop of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankara), India
6 Nov 199560.2AppointedArchbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
10 Feb 200569.4AppointedMajor Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
18 Jan 200771.4DiedMajor Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Cyril Baselios Malancharuvil
Archbishop Cyril Baselios Malancharuvil O.I.C. (born , died ) Major Archbishop of Trivandrum

EventPlace
Birth PlacePandalam

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017