Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geevarghese Timotheos Chundevalel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1928Born
24 Aug 195325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
30 Apr 198860.2AppointedBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
6 Aug 198860.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
29 Mar 200375.1RetiredBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
4 Jun 201991.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Geevarghese Timotheos Chundevalel
Bishop Geevarghese Timotheos Chundevalel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tiruvalla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmayannoor
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Cathedral, Tiruvalla, Eparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara)
Death PlaceTiruvalla, Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara)

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,235
  • d: CB, 3 Jun 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast