Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese)

Eparchia Batteriensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Eparchy
  • Erected: 28 October 1978
  • Metropolitan: Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese)
  • Syro-Malankarese Catholic Church of the Antiochian Tradition
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 67,482 (26,064 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Bishop's House, Sulthan Bathery-673592, Waynad Dt., Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (04936)220.207
  • Fax: 221.287

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 October 1978ErectedEparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese) Eparchy of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese) (erected)
15 May 2006Metropolitan ChangedEparchy of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese) (from Trivandrum)
25 January 2010Territory LostEparchy of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese) Eparchy of Puthur (Syro-Malankarese) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
198010,0002062638465858ap1981
199019,0001,710,6001.1%38947404912780ap1991*
199924,2501,756,0001.4%69148329214215113ap2000
200024,0001,702,2001.4%7213852821323122ap2001
200125,0001,702,5001.5%8513982551424022ap2002
200225,2001,702,9501.5%8213952651324622ap2003
200325,4251,703,1251.5%87131002541325322ap2004
200425,5121,703,4261.5%92131052421326022ap2005
200625,5871,723,0001.5%89121012531227622ap2007
200927,8001,793,0001.6%72148632314259121ap2010
201223,0001,868,0001.2%696753066298104ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013