Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulos Philoxinos Ayyamkulangara

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India

Titular Bishop of Chaialum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1928Born
24 Dec 196133.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 196739.0AppointedBishop
16 Dec 196739.6Ordained BishopBishop
28 Aug 197749.3AppointedBishop
28 Aug 197749.3Converted
11 Oct 197749.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
11 Oct 197749.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Chaialum
3 Nov 199870.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Paulos Philoxinos Ayyamkulangara
Archbishop Paulos Philoxinos Ayyamkulangara (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaramthode

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 27 Jun 2020

Quantcast