Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isaac Youhanon Koottaplakil

Deceased

Bishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1930Born
7 Dec 195424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
28 Oct 197848.3AppointedBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
28 Dec 197848.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
28 Apr 198756.8DiedBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Isaac Youhanon Koottaplakil
Bishop Isaac Youhanon Koottaplakil (born , died ) Bishop of Tiruvalla

EventPlace
Birth PlacePazhoor

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast