Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedict Varghese Gregorios Thangalathil, O.I.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1916BornKallooppara
24 Aug 194428.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Imitation of Christ
25 Oct 195236.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese), India
25 Oct 195236.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Antarados
29 Jan 195336.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antarados
27 Jan 195538.9AppointedArchbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese), India
10 Oct 199478.6DiedArchbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese), India

MicroData Summary for Benedict Varghese Gregorios Thangalathil:
Archbishop Benedict Varghese Gregorios Thangalathil O.I.C. (born , died ) Archbishop of Trivandrum

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015