Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanasios Cheriyan Polachirakal

Deceased

Bishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1909BornTiruvalla
24 Aug 194637.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
31 Dec 195344.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
31 Dec 195344.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta dei Maroniti
22 Apr 195445.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta dei Maroniti
27 Jan 195545.9AppointedBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India
29 Sep 197768.6DiedBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankarese), India

MicroData Summary for Athanasios Cheriyan Polachirakal:
Bishop Athanasios Cheriyan Polachirakal (born , died ) Bishop of Tiruvalla

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015