Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Paulos Kulapuravilai

Bishop of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1964 Born
2 Jan 199126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jan 201046.0AppointedBishop of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India
13 Mar 201046.1Ordained BishopBishop of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India
14 Mar 201046.1InstalledBishop of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Vincent Paulos Kulapuravilai
Bishop Vincent Paulos Kulapuravilai (born ) Bishop of Marthandom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnakkarai
Ordained BishopMar Ivanios Stadium, Thiruvananthapuram

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,585

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018