Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yoohanon Chrysostom Kalloor

Bishop Emeritus of Pathanamthitta (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1944 Born
5 May 197328.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Apr 199853.9AppointedBishop of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India
29 Jun 199854.1Ordained BishopBishop of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jan 201065.6AppointedBishop of Pathanamthitta (Syro-Malankara), India
7 Jun 201975.0RetiredBishop of Pathanamthitta (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Yoohanon Chrysostom Kalloor
Bishop Yoohanon Chrysostom Kalloor (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pathanamthitta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKadammanitta
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Mar Ivanios College, Trivandrum, Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Pathanamthitta (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,349
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast