Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Irenios Kattukallil

Coadjutor Bishop of Pathanamthitta (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1952 Born
22 Dec 197826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jan 201057.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jan 201057.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamalluma
13 Mar 201057.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamalluma
10 Apr 201865.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pathanamthitta (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Samuel Irenios Kattukallil
Bishop Samuel Irenios Kattukallil (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Pathanamthitta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKadammanitta
Ordained BishopMar Ivanios Stadium, Thiruvananthapuram

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Pathanamthitta (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,582
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast