Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippos Stephanos Thottathil

Bishop of Saint Mary, Queen of Peace (Syro-Malankara), USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1952 Born
1978²25.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
27 Apr 197926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jan 201057.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jan 201057.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
13 Mar 201057.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
5 Aug 201765.2AppointedBishop of Saint Mary, Queen of Peace (Syro-Malankara), USA
28 Oct 201765.4InstalledBishop of Saint Mary, Queen of Peace (Syro-Malankara), USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippos Stephanos Thottathil
Bishop Philippos Stephanos Thottathil (born ) Bishop of Saint Mary, Queen of Peace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRanni
Ordained PriestSt. Mary's, Malankara, Church, Karimpanamkuzhy, Ranni
Ordained BishopMar Ivanios Stadium, Thiruvananthapuram

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Mary, Queen of Peace (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,583
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2017
  • i: CB, 5 Aug 2017
  • od/c0/loc: CB, 24 Oct 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 25 Oct 2022