Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gheevarghese (George) Kurisummoottil

Auxiliary Bishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India

Titular Bishop of Chaialum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1961 Born
27 Dec 198726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
29 Aug 202059.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
29 Aug 202059.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chaialum
14 Nov 202059.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chaialum

MicroData Summary for Gheevarghese (George) Kurisummoottil
Bishop Gheevarghese (George) Kurisummoottil (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kottayam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTiruvalla, Eparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara)
Ordained BishopTiruvalla, Archeparchy of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archeparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2020
  • ob: CB, 19 Oct 2020
  • c2+: CB, 13 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast