Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geevarghese Makarios Kalayil

Bishop of Puthur (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1958 Born
1 May 198627.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 201759.0AppointedBishop of Puthur (Syro-Malankara), India
21 Sep 201759.1Ordained BishopBishop of Puthur (Syro-Malankara), India
30 Sep 201759.2InstalledBishop of Puthur (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Geevarghese Makarios Kalayil
Bishop Geevarghese Makarios Kalayil (born ) Bishop of Puthur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRenjalady
Ordained BishopMar Ivanios Nagar, Adoor

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Puthur (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2017
  • ob/i: CB, 5 Aug 2017
  • c2: CB, 18 Aug 2017
  • c3: CB, 21 Sep 2017
  • c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2017
  • c234: CB, 25 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 25 Sep 2017