Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Chang Bong-hun

Bishop of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1947 BornUmsong-gun
3 May 197629.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}, Korea (South)
3 Jun 199952.4AppointedBishop of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}, Korea (South)
24 Aug 199952.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Chang Bong-hun:
Bishop Gabriel Chang Bong-hun (born ) Bishop of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013