Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Román Casanova Casanova

Bishop of Vic, Spain

Apostolic Administrator of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1956 Born
17 May 198124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tortosa, Spain
13 Jun 200346.7AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
14 Sep 200347.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
23 Aug 202164.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Román Casanova Casanova
Bishop Román Casanova Casanova (born ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDeltebre
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vic, Diocese of Vic

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vic.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,463
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • aadm: Bollettino, 23 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast