Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Cancian, F.A.M.

Bishop of Cittą di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1947 BornMareno di Piave
15 Aug 197124.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sons of Merciful Love
18 Jul 197225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sons of Merciful Love
15 Jul 200457.2AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Sons of Merciful Love
16 Jun 200760.1AppointedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
15 Sep 200760.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
23 Sep 200760.4InstalledBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Cancian:
Bishop Domenico Cancian F.A.M. (born ) Bishop of Cittą di Castello

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cittą di Castello.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,510

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015