Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Cabrejas Molina

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1681BornVillarejo Sobrehuerta
5 May 173856.4AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
3 Jun 173856.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jaén, Spain
4 Sep 174664.7DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Cabrejas Molina:
Bishop Andrés Cabrejas Molina (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,580
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 56, Number 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015