Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Cabezas Aristizábal, C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Villavicencio, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1943 Born
24 May 196925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
22 Apr 198844.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
22 Apr 198844.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Minor
4 Jun 198844.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Minor
13 May 199248.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
3 May 199450.3SucceededBishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
16 Jun 200157.5ResignedBishop of Villavicencio, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Cabezas Aristizábal
Bishop Alfonso Cabezas Aristizábal C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Villavicencio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeiva

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Villavicencio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,810

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018