Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Burke

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Simla and Chandigarh

Titular Bishop of Bononia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1896BornDublin, Ireland
21 Jun 192125.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 195963.2AppointedBishop of Simla, India
1 Nov 195963.6Ordained BishopBishop of Simla, India
3 Aug 196670.4ResignedBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
3 Aug 196670.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bononia
24 Jul 197074.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Simla and Chandigarh, India

MicroData Summary for John Burke:
Bishop John Burke (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Simla and Chandigarh

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013