Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Bündgens

Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen

Titular Bishop of Árd Carna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1956 BornEschweiler
10 Oct 198024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Aachen, Germany
15 Mar 200650.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
15 Mar 200650.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Árd Carna
20 May 200650.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Árd Carna

MicroData Summary for Johannes Bündgens:
Bishop Johannes Bündgens (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aachen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013