Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert-Leo Bundervoet, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rabaul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1917BornEvergem, Belgium
9 Aug 194224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
6 Mar 198062.5AppointedArchbishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
11 May 198062.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
16 Aug 198971.9DiedArchbishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Albert-Leo Bundervoet:
Archbishop Albert-Leo Bundervoet M.S.C. (born , died ) Archbishop of Rabaul

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1989, Page 520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013