Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Bullet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Glavinitza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1921Born
8 Jul 194524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
29 Dec 197049.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
29 Dec 197049.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Glavinitza
6 Feb 197149.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Glavinitza
16 Nov 199372.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
7 Sep 201190.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Bullet
Bishop Gabriel Bullet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstavayer-Le-Lac

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 8 Sep 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018