Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent DePaul Breen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Metuchen, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1936BornBrooklyn
15 Jul 196225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
8 Jul 199760.5AppointedBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
8 Sep 199760.7Ordained BishopBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
4 Jan 200265.0ResignedBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
30 Mar 200366.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Vincent DePaul Breen:
Bishop Vincent DePaul Breen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Metuchen

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,045
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013