Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jurij Bizjak

Bishop of Koper


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1947 BornCol
29 Jun 197124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Koper, Slovenia
13 May 200053.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Koper, Slovenia
13 May 200053.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gergis
5 Jul 200053.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gergis
26 May 201265.3AppointedBishop of Koper, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Jurij Bizjak:
Bishop Jurij Bizjak (born ) Bishop of Koper

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Koper.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,806

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013