Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Berenbrinker

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Panatoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1950 BornVerl
11 Jun 197727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
19 Apr 200857.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Apr 200857.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Panatoria
15 Jun 200858.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panatoria

MicroData Summary for Hubert Berenbrinker:
Bishop Hubert Berenbrinker (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Paderborn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,762

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013