Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heraldo Camilo A. Barotto

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Caeciri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1922Born
18 Dec 194826.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 197350.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
30 Jan 197350.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
1 Apr 197350.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caeciri
12 Aug 198360.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Heraldo Camilo A. Barotto
Bishop Heraldo Camilo A. Barotto (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rosario

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Jorge

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018