Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Alcides Balbín Tamayo

Bishop of Caldas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1958 BornSanta Rosa de Osos
19 Nov 198527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
28 Jan 201556.3AppointedBishop of Caldas, Colombia
7 Mar 201556.4Ordained BishopBishop of Caldas, Colombia
19 Mar 201556.5InstalledBishop of Caldas, Colombia

MicroData Summary for César Alcides Balbín Tamayo:
Bishop César Alcides Balbín Tamayo (born ) Bishop of Caldas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caldas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2015
  • ob/i/c1: CB, 28 Jan 2015
  • c2+: CB, 5 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015