Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amando Agosto Bahlmann, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate of Santarém, Para, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Argos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1862Born
25 Aug 188018.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 Sep 188826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jan 190744.6AppointedPrelate of Santarém, Para, Brazil
10 Jul 190846.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
19 Jul 190846.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
5 Mar 193976.8DiedPrelate of Santarém, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Amando Agosto Bahlmann
Bishop Amando Agosto Bahlmann O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate of Santarém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEssen, Germany

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 66
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018