Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal Ascencio García

Bishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1955 Born
5 May 198429.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
4 May 198530.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
17 Nov 201459.6AppointedBishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México
12 Feb 201559.8Ordained BishopBishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Ascencio García
Bishop Cristóbal Ascencio García (born ) Bishop of Apatzingán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Josefino de Allende

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Apatzingán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2014
  • od/op/c01: CB, 17 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 20 Nov 2014
  • c3: CB, 13 Feb 2015
  • c4: CB, 15 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast