Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Edivalter Andrade

Bishop-Elect of Floriano, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1962 Born
8 Oct 198927.4Ordained PriestPriest of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
29 Mar 201754.9AppointedBishop of Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
10 Jun 201755.1Ordained BishopBishop of Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
24 Jun 201755.1InstalledBishop of Floriano, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edivalter Andrade
Father Edivalter Andrade (born ) Bishop-Elect of Floriano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarra de São Francisco, Diocese of São Mateus, Espirito Santo
Ordained BishopEstadio Municipal, Barra de São Francisco, Diocese of São Mateus, Espirito Santo

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Floriano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2017
  • ob/i: CB, 2 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CB, 20 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017