Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mario de Jesús Álvarez Gómez

Bishop-Elect of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1959 Born
19 Nov 198526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
3 Feb 201858.2AppointedBishop of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia
3 Mar 201858.3Ordained BishopBishop of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Mario de Jesús Álvarez Gómez
Father Mario de Jesús Álvarez Gómez (born ) Bishop-Elect of Istmina-Tadó

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalmitas, Diocese of Santa Rosa de Osos
Ordained BishopIstmina, Diocese of Istmina-Tadó

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Istmina-Tadó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2018
  • c1: CB, 4 Feb 2018
  • ob: CB, 10 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 10 Feb 2018