Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcel Honorat Léon Agboton

Archbishop Emeritus of Cotonou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1941 BornAvrankou
6 Jan 196625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Novo, Benin
19 Dec 199453.9AppointedBishop of Kandi, Benin
25 Mar 199554.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kandi, Benin
29 Jan 200059.0AppointedBishop of Porto Novo, Benin
18 Jun 200059.4InstalledBishop of Porto Novo, Benin
5 Mar 200564.1AppointedArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
2 Apr 200564.2InstalledArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
21 Aug 201069.6ResignedArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Marcel Honorat Léon Agboton:
Archbishop Marcel Honorat Léon Agboton (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cotonou

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cotonou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Aug 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,537
  • i: Website of the Diocese, 18 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013