Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Fuzhou [Foochow]

Archidioecesis Fuceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Lin Jiashan, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 32,348 (12,494 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Fuzhou, Fujian, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu)
15 October 1696ErectedDiocese of Nanking [Nanjing] Vicariate Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Houkouang (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu) (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Yunnan (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Fukien, Chekiang, and Kiangsi
1790UnitedVicariate Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam}
Vicariate Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}
Vicariate Apostolic of Fukien, Chekiang, and Kiangsi
16 August 1838SplitVicariate Apostolic of Fukien, Chekiang, and Kiangsi Vicariate Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam} and Kiangsi
Vicariate Apostolic of Fo-Kien
Vicariate Apostolic of Fo-Kien
16 August 1838SplitVicariate Apostolic of Fukien, Chekiang, and Kiangsi Vicariate Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam} and Kiangsi
Vicariate Apostolic of Fo-Kien
3 December 1883Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fo-Kien Vicariate Apostolic of Amoy (erected)
27 December 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fo-Kien Vicariate Apostolic of Funing [Xiapu] (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Tingchow [Changting] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Foochow [Fuzhou]
27 December 1923Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Fo-Kien Vicariate Apostolic of Foochow [Fuzhou]
18 July 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Foochow [Fuzhou] Mission "Sui Iuris" of Shaowu [Shaowu] (erected)
6 May 1931Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Foochow [Fuzhou] Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kienow [Jian’ou] (erected)
Archdiocese of Fuzhou [Foochow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Foochow [Fuzhou] Archdiocese of Fuzhou [Foochow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Fuzhou [Foochow]
195040,5252,975,7301.4%2712391,039ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast