Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Christophe Louis Yves Georges Cardinal Pierre

Apostolic Nuncio to United States of America

Cardinal-Deacon of San Benedetto fuori Porta San Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1946 Born
5 Apr 197024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
12 Jul 199549.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gunela
12 Jul 199549.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
24 Sep 199549.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gunela
10 May 199953.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uganda
22 Mar 200761.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to México
12 Apr 201670.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to United States of America
30 Sep 202377.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Benedetto fuori Porta San Paolo
30 Sep 202377.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Apr 202478.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Benedetto fuori Porta San Paolo

MicroData Summary for Christophe Louis Yves Georges Pierre
(WikiData: Q553540)
Christophe Louis Yves Georges Cardinal Pierre (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of United States of America

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
Ordained PriestSaint-Vincent, Cathedral, Saint-Malo, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
Ordained BishopSaint-Vincent, Cathedral, Saint-Malo, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

Please contact the Cardinal through the Nunciature to United States of America.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,613
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 252, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1.loc: CB, 18 Oct 2022
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2023
  • cdea: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2023
  • i: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 5 Jul 2024