Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Víctor Alejandro Aguilar Ledesma

Bishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1965 Born
10 Dec 198924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
1 Dec 201550.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
1 Dec 201550.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Castulo
25 Feb 201650.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castulo
12 Jun 202156.1AppointedBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México
12 Jul 202156.2InstalledBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Víctor Alejandro Aguilar Ledesma
Bishop Víctor Alejandro Aguilar Ledesma (born ) Bishop of Celaya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Guillermo
Ordained BishopUnidad Deportiva Bicentenario, Morelia, Archdiocese of Morelia, Michoacán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Celaya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2015
  • c1: CB, 1 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 7 Dec 2015
  • c2+: CB, 25 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,847
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2021
  • i: CB, 15 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jun 2021

Quantcast