Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidencio López Plaza

Bishop of Querétaro, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1950 Born
16 Sep 198030.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Querétaro, México
19 Feb 198231.8Ordained PriestPriest of Querétaro, México
2 Mar 201564.8AppointedBishop of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México
20 May 201565.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México
12 Sep 202070.3AppointedBishop of Querétaro, México
20 Oct 202070.4InstalledBishop of Querétaro, México

MicroData Summary for Fidencio López Plaza
Bishop Fidencio López Plaza (born ) Bishop of Querétaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapullín
Ordained BishopTerrero Juan Pablo II, Catemaco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Querétaro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2015
  • ob: CB, 3 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 15 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,493
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2020
  • i: CB, 21 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast