Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hipólito Reyes Larios

Deceased

Archbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1946Born
15 Aug 197327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México
15 Apr 200053.6AppointedBishop of Orizaba, Veracruz, México
13 Jun 200053.8Ordained BishopBishop of Orizaba, Veracruz, México
10 Apr 200760.6AppointedArchbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México
19 Jun 200760.8InstalledArchbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México
8 Aug 202174.9DiedArchbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Hipólito Reyes Larios
Archbishop Hipólito Reyes Larios (born , died ) Archbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad Mendoza
Ordained BishopCentro de espectáculos La Concordia, Orizaba, Diocese of Orizaba, Veracruz
Death PlaceHospital, Xapala, Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Xapala, Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,784
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Aug 2021

Quantcast