Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Cuapio Bautista

Bishop of Iztapalapa, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1967 Born
15 Aug 199225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Texcoco, México, México
4 Mar 201547.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
4 Mar 201547.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisarcio
27 May 201548.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisarcio
14 Aug 202154.3AppointedBishop of Iztapalapa, México, México
11 Oct 202154.5InstalledBishop of Iztapalapa, México, México

MicroData Summary for Jorge Cuapio Bautista
Bishop Jorge Cuapio Bautista (born ) Bishop of Iztapalapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Ana Chiauhteman
Ordained Bishoplos Remedios, Basilica, Naucalpan de Juárez

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iztapalapa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2015
  • ob: CB, 23 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 27 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,496
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2021
  • i: AM, 5 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Oct 2021

Quantcast