Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Kurt Cardinal Koch

President of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity

Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1950 Born
20 Jun 198232.2Ordained PriestPriest of Basel {Ble, Basilea}, Switzerland
21 Aug 199545.4SelectedBishop of Basel {Ble, Basilea}, Switzerland
6 Dec 199545.7ConfirmedBishop of Basel {Ble, Basilea}, Switzerland
6 Jan 199645.8Ordained BishopBishop of Basel {Ble, Basilea}, Switzerland
1 Jul 201060.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
1 Jul 201060.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
20 Nov 201060.6Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201060.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore
1 Jan 201160.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore
28 Feb 201362.9CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
16 Mar 201363.0ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
3 May 202171.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore

MicroData Summary for Kurt Koch (VIAF: 114038461)
Kurt Cardinal Koch (born ) President of Promoting Christian Unity

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEmmenbrcke
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,644
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast