Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto Wüst

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1926Born
10 Oct 195327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
27 Nov 197549.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
27 Nov 197549.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubia
1 Feb 197649.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubia
2 Sep 198256.2SelectedBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
21 Sep 198256.3ConfirmedBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
1 Nov 198256.4InstalledBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
26 Oct 199367.4ResignedBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
19 Aug 200276.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Otto Wüst (VIAF: 66492152)
Bishop Otto Wüst (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSursee
Ordained BishopSt. Ursus, Cathedral, Solothurn, Diocese of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,096

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast