Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcelo Cardinal González Martín

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1918Born
29 Jun 194123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valladolid, Spain
31 Dec 196042.9AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
5 Mar 196143.1Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
21 Feb 196648.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Barcelona, Spain
21 Feb 196648.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Casae Medianae
7 Jan 196748.9SucceededArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
3 Dec 197153.8AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
5 Mar 197355.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197355.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
23 Jun 199577.4RetiredArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
25 Aug 200486.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Marcelo González Martín
Marcelo Cardinal González Martín (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanubla
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Asunción, Cathedral, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
  • a cardinal for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Jun 2021

Quantcast