Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josep 聲gel S壾z Meneses

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1956 Born
15 Jul 198427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
1989²32.4IncardinatedPriest of Barcelona, Spain
30 Oct 200145.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
30 Oct 200145.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Selemselae
15 Dec 200145.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selemselae
15 Jun 200447.8AppointedBishop of Terrassa, Spain
25 Jul 200447.9InstalledBishop of Terrassa, Spain
17 Apr 202164.7AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
12 Jun 202164.8InstalledArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josep 聲gel S壾z Meneses
Archbishop Josep 聲gel S壾z Meneses (born ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSisante
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 731
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,088
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2021
  • i: CB, 17 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast