Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Palmero Ramos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1936Born
13 Sep 195923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Astorga, Spain
1972²35.4IncardinatedPriest of Toledo, Spain
24 Nov 198751.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
24 Nov 198751.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Petina
24 Jan 198851.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petina
9 Jan 199659.4AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
26 Nov 200569.3AppointedBishop of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain
27 Jul 201276.0RetiredBishop of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain
8 Mar 202184.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Palmero Ramos (VIAF: 89597915)
Bishop Rafael Palmero Ramos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orihuela-Alicante

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorales del Rey
Ordained PriestAtorga, Diocese of Astorga
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceAlicante, Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,524
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2012
  • d: CB, 8 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast